Financial history WARLEY BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1138906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £112.37k £102.84k £108.91k £112.16k £0
Total expenditure £119.26k £129.41k £112.74k £111.89k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A