OASIS COMMUNITY HUB: OLDHAM

Charity number: 1138862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.68k £82.31k £118.67k £170.73k £94.38k
Total expenditure £100 £42.96k £85.81k £132.46k £89.86k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A