Accounts and annual returns LEICESTERSHIRE MIXED HERITAGE FORUM

Charity number: 1138824
Charity reporting is overdue by 1575 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 114 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 114 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 479 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 479 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 845 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 845 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1210 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1210 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1575 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1575 days