Trustees THE RAMSGATE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1138809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN VINCENT WALKER Chair 20 May 2015
THE CANTERBURY SOCIETY
Received: On time
RAMSGATE CLOCK HOUSE HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
KENT FEDERATION OF AMENITY SOCIETIES
Overdue by 110 days
THE WHITSTABLE MUSIC SOCIETY
Received: 60 days late
Paul Douglas Shearer Trustee 19 May 2022
None on record
Terry Prue Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Graham Frank Woolnough Trustee 15 May 2019
RAMSGATE CLOCK HOUSE HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
Michael Ashley Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
RICHARD STEPHEN OADES Trustee 01 January 2016
RAMSGATE ARTS FESTIVAL LTD
Overdue by 202 days