Trustees CHRIST SHELTER MINISTRY INTERNATIONAL
Charity number: 1138603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Osei Hemeng | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
ERIC OSEI-WUSU | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
REV AGYENIM-BOATENG | Trustee | 05 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Kwaku Esaakow | Trustee | 26 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev SAMUEL BOADI DANQUAH | Trustee | 24 September 2010 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.