Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SEBASTIAN, WOKINGHAM
Charity number: 1139933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rickey Simpson-Gray | Chair | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Metson | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Christopher John Bull | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Wickens | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Thompson | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Morrison | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Murray Foulds | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Beatrice Unwin | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Birch | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Paul Smart | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sue Thomas | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RICHARD CONGRAM | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Suman Shrestha | Trustee | 18 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANET FRANCES ROGERS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.