Financial history THE CHARIS TRUST

Charity number: 1140637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.34m £1.36m £1.38m £79.23k £160.72k
Total expenditure £854.55k £1.06m £817.98k £714.58k £1.37m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.24m £1.25m £1.25m N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £68.89k £65.80k £69.05k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £32.22k £42.34k £61.64k N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £847.48k £1.06m £812.74k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.07k £7.01k £5.24k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £10.50k £9.13k £6.00k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £677.41k £985.80k £723.24k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £7.07k £7.01k £5.24k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A