Trustees BARROW FARM RIDING FOR THE DISABLED LIMITED
Charity number: 1139280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Brian Wood | Chair | 17 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Joanne Willcox | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Mawby | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN BURCHETT | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Anne Elizabeth Mitchell | Trustee | 26 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham Paul Fairhead | Trustee | 17 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr ISOBEL RACHEL GOWERS | Trustee | 09 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
EMMA HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JO MOSS ROWE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES KEARNEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr KAREN LEHNER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.