Trustees THE METHODIST CHURCH GWENT HILLS AND VALES CIRCUIT (2/13)
Charity number: 1140255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
55 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Catherine Brobbey | Chair | 23 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorette Jayne Hinson B.A.Th | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Gareth Powell | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judy Maloney | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Allan David Edwards | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Manuokafoa Tu'ipulotu | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Saunders | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Marina Jones | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARION LAWRENCE | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Mills | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Peploe | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Celia Price | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gwyneth Sian Gould | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Yvonne Powell | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Marshall | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carole Welsby | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
SIAN MILLAR | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|||||
ERIC AUSTIN SMITH | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Gillian Timm | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Timm | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Lyndon Holyfield | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
June Claire Rogers | Trustee | 16 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrea Sims | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steve Boxall | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Jeff Mudford | Trustee | 23 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne White | Trustee | 12 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Robin Bailey | Trustee | 28 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Maldwyn John Jones | Trustee | 27 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JEANETTE ROBINSON | Trustee | 02 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE JONES | Trustee | 28 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET JANE WEBBER | Trustee | 07 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANE EVANS | Trustee | 05 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANTHONY CLIFFORD GREGORY M.B.E. | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
HAYDN JEFFREYS | Trustee | 17 May 2012 |
|
|||||
JOAN PRICE | Trustee | 12 July 1997 |
|
|
||||
MR LEN KISBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLINE YVONNE ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE VERONICA O'NEILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY JONES | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS SUE PREECE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA MERYL COX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ENID HOWELLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAMELA PARTRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN BRONWEN RADFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JOSIE ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GAIL ASHWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP HOBBS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JAN JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN ZIOMEK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev ROY MORGAN WATSON BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEACON GWEN KNIGHTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Margaret Elizabeth Cook | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREA ROGERS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.