OXFORD BROOKES STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1140275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £1.39m £1.44m £1.52m £1.45m £1.40m
Total expenditure £1.35m £1.59m £1.46m £1.57m £1.78m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £32.34k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.17m £1.20m £1.24m £1.19m £1.19m
Income - Other trading activities £123.55k £119.29k £133.67k £113.93k £130.61k
Income - Charitable activities £83.90k £114.21k £134.39k £113.11k £53.39k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £505 £278 £0 £597 £810
Income - Other £9.74k £9.89k £9.97k £32.61k £26.39k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.33m £1.56m £1.44m £1.54m £1.75m
Expenditure - Raising funds £19.47k £24.15k £23.92k £22.48k £26.85k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £25.77k £0 £0 £25.72k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0