Trustees FIORENTINI FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1140414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sammie Squire | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD FOGELMAN | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hussain Ahmed | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Tam Kocak-Bass | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anastasia Petrova | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Attila Angus Aziz Kent | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Zoe Patricia Sadler | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nick Whiteley | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.