Trustees NORFOLK SCHOOLS SAILING ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1142627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andy Goff | Chair | 17 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Harrison | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Percival | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Archer | Trustee | 15 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jennings | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUE ELIZABETH HEAD | Trustee | 28 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAUL TIMOTHY BONHAM | Trustee | 28 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MITCHELMORE | Trustee | 28 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY ROBERT MILLS | Trustee | 28 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
RUTH ELIZABETH BONHAM | Trustee | 21 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
NEIL THURLOW | Trustee | 21 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN DAVID ALAN KING | Trustee | 21 March 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.