Financial history ZERO CARBON WORLD LIMITED

Charity number: 1141347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £10.45k £230 £17.95k £1.59k £3.22k
Total expenditure £82 £4.40k £21.89k £3.83k £3.65k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A