AFRICAN HEALTH FORUM

Charity number: 1141786
Charity reporting is overdue by 238 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 238 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 238 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 June 2020 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 July 2019 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 May 2018 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 March 2017 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required