Accounts and annual returns Friends of the Zimbabwe Academy of Music

Charity number: 1140488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required