Trustees UNIVERSITY OF YORK GRADUATE STUDENTS' ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1142381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Sandison | Chair | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Tian Shen | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
ZeHui Zhang | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Maierdanni Nasier | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Amy Mitchell | Trustee | 17 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dominic Smithies | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sinead Daly | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
GRAHAM BRISCOE | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Patrick Johnson | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Ambar Shaikh | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Ali Chahine | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.