Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER HARBORNE, BIRMINGHAM
Charity number: 1140018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Katharine Elizabeth Stowe | Chair | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Imogen Reeves | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John Blower | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Mark Temple | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katharine Frances Blyth | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Elizabeth Bell | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Brian Abraham | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
VERONICA JANE JAMES | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Eamon Fergal Mooney | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Charlotte Louise Gibson | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diana Phillips | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sidney James Werrin | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Clarke | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janice Willcox | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Swain | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Diane Reeves | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Philpot | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER HARGREAVES | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Susan Lister | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Anne Collins | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIA HOWL | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
KEITH ALEXANDER WHITEHEAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR MAGGIE DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.