ALVERDALE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1140643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 23 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 18 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required