Trustees WALTON COMMUNITY & ENTERPRISE PARTNERSHIP
Charity number: 1141033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Trevor Latham | Chair | 22 February 2013 |
|
|||||||||||
Terence John May | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Michael Alexander Hindley | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rita Lacey | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
REG TOWNER | Trustee | 22 February 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Trevor Martin Latham | Trustee | 10 November 2009 |
|
|
||||||||||
VALERIE CUMINE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
JOHN KEITH TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
BRENDA NETTLETON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.