Financial history Global Vision Initiative

Charity number: 1142264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £30.20k £32.54k £57.43k £105.23k £162.53k
Total expenditure £30.10k £32.17k £57.24k £105.11k £160.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £400 N/A N/A N/A N/A