Financial history MEDWAY STREET PASTORS

Charity number: 1141384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £3.50k £19.26k £4.76k £8.40k £1.71k
Total expenditure £13.64k £22.75k £4.01k £3.36k £921
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.00k N/A N/A N/A