Accounts and annual returns SCHOOL OF ROCK OUTDOOR ACTIVITY CLUB

Charity number: 1140693
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 240 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 240 days
Annual return 01 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 605 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 605 days
Annual return 01 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 971 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 971 days
Annual return 01 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1336 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1336 days
Annual return 01 April 2017 26 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required