ROTARY CLUB OF LINCOLN COLONIA

Charity number: 1140234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £88.55k £78.64k £84.91k £45.89k £53.39k
Total expenditure £89.41k £77.14k £48.27k £82.56k £55.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A