Financial history HELP, EDUCATION AND RESOURCES TO BRING EVERYONE ALL TOGETHER

Charity number: 1140548
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £60.61k £66.62k £59.29k £67.25k £47.97k
Total expenditure £48.30k £51.84k £53.00k £56.88k £47.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A