THE DONCASTER CANCER DETECTION TRUST

Charity number: 501667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £89.56k £258.03k £60.45k £144.92k £19.22k
Total expenditure £6.89k £5.34k £6.49k £443.43k £3.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A