Governing document White Ribbon Alliance UK
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/08/2011 as amended on 15 Aug 2023 as amended on 22 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
The objects of the Charity (the “Objects”) are, for the public benefit, to preserve and protect good health and to advance education, in particular but not exclusively, by providing information, education, services, advocacy and resources relating to safe sexual and reproductive health, primarily for those facing the greatest disadvantage.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.