Trustees THE ARTS SOCIETY LIVERPOOL
Charity number: 1141525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eileen Mitchell BDs | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy John Mitchell BA BArch | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mary Cunliffe | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Mary Wylie | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Rudd | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carole Ann Black | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Elizabeth Gordon | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Mair Pierce Moulton | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary McCulloch | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mr Chris Roberts | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ERIC BRADSHAW FCA | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.