THE SHAW CENTRE

Charity number: 1141871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £212.60k £196.76k £207.51k £198.89k £198.83k
Total expenditure £205.89k £188.76k £203.55k £197.68k £190.49k
Income from government contracts £172.76k £157.12k N/A N/A £1.36k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £157.12k £1.36k £161.83k