Trustees THE CHORAL FOUNDATION, THE CHAPEL ROYAL, HAMPTON COURT PALACE
Charity number: 1142075
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Andrew Cutts | Chair | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Justin Simon Mark Basini | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel David Walley | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Louise Crowther | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Alexander MacDougall | Trustee | 04 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER SCULLY | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|||||
RICHARD FARRAR ROTHWELL | Trustee | 24 May 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.