Trustees INTERLINK RCT
Charity number: 1141143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dilys Jouvenat | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Tony Hendrickson | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Theaker | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Ann Wills | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Walters | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Flowerdew | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Janet Whiteman | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN DAVIES | Trustee | 24 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE RICHARDS | Trustee | 16 March 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.