Financial history ACTIVITY CLUB COVENTRY LTD

Charity number: 1142291
Charity reporting is overdue by 80 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £16.05k £3.39k £4.68k £17.17k £3.95k
Total expenditure £16.65k £9.33k £5.96k £14.50k £7.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A