Trustees BIRKBECK COLLEGE STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1142614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Artemi Falzon | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chantal Stehwien | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cecilia Danielsson | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ikenna Okoye-Ahaneku | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Gibbs | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tonya Moralez | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ibrahim Badmus | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daisy Jeanrenaud | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Manpreet Kaur Dhesi | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Rebecca Hope | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jose Pedro Ruao Nunes Malheiro Campos | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Reece Thompson | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zeno Frediani | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alex Prestage | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.