Trustees ACCESS DORSET LTD

Charity number: 1142171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANNE ELVA SIMPSON Chair 31 May 2011
None on record
Andrew Stephen Bule Trustee 21 August 2021
None on record
Robert David Picken Trustee 04 August 2021
None on record
CAROLINE KING Trustee 01 March 2016
SOUTH EAST DORSET COMMUNITY ACCESSIBLE TRANSPORT
Received: On time
Lisa Marie Brooks Trustee 19 May 2015
DOUBLE ACT THEATRE COMPANY
Received: On time
MICHAEL DAVID HURST Trustee 31 May 2011
None on record
DAVID LAWRENCE OAKLEY Trustee 31 May 2011
None on record