Trustees MAKE A DIFFERENCE (SRI LANKA) LTD
Charity number: 1143573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joseph Marshall Figurado | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Theophilus Samuel David Rajoopillai | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chelliah Krishnamoorthy | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Veerasingam Mahalingasivam | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elayathamby Thevarajah | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shamini Rajan | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thiruparan Thuraisingam | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karthigaayini Nadanakumaran | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laleesh Chandramoorthy | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
RATNASWAMY MUTHUKUMAR | Trustee | 30 August 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.