ANCHOR CARE

Charity number: 1141563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £820 £920 £1.56k £1.05k £2.10k
Total expenditure £730 £880 £1.53k £1.03k £2.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A