Accounts and annual returns AL-FAROOQ ISLAMIC ACADEMY
Charity number: 1143243
Charity reporting is overdue by 1153 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 57 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 57 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 423 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 423 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 788 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 788 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1153 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1153 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | 13 July 2020 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window