Financial history MELTHAM COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1142100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £55.64k £71.96k £105.93k £2.84k £75.01k
Total expenditure £51.46k £54.68k £67.42k £57.81k £63.50k
Income from government contracts £44.10k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £66.17k