Trustees Ebenezer Baptist Church (Mold)
Charity number: 1144374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Raiborde | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robin Probert | Trustee | 04 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jon Edwards | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Moira Reynolds | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Benjamin Midgely | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Scott Liddell | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Benjamin Slatter | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
FIEC | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
James Mitton | Trustee | 01 January 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.