Accounts and annual returns NEW LONDON EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1142105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 December 2018 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window