Financial history NEW LONDON EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1142105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £918.08k £881.29k £2.15m £2.27m £2.54m
Total expenditure £847.59k £841.82k £1.73m £2.35m £2.50m
Income from government contracts £692.00k £711.00k £2.05m £2.15m £2.37m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £2.15m £0
Income - Other trading activities £881.55k £711.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £2.05m £0 £2.37m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £36.53k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £170.29k £105.46k £124.14k £170.01k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £826.78k £826.00k £1.73m £1.29m £1.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £1.06m £1.12m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £24.05k £13.02k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £20.81k £15.82k £0 £0 £0