CHRIST CHURCH STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1142619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 12 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 12 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 08 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 29 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 29 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 17 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 17 March 2017 On time Download