CHRIST CHURCH STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1142619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Francesca Anne McGregor Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Graham Owen Briscoe Trustee 18 October 2019
THE BATH AND WELLS DBE TRUST Received: On time
Madeline Young Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
John Dieter Adams Trustee 24 October 2014 None on record
Bethany Mair Ellen Elwood Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
Michael Wigg Trustee 06 July 2018 None on record
Oliver Richard John King Trustee 15 October 2020 None on record
Joseph Cooper Trustee 24 June 2016 None on record
Professor Helen James OBE Trustee 24 October 2014 None on record
Christopher John Connelly Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Daniel Joe Bichener Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record