Accounts and annual returns THE EAST AND WEST LAUGHTON ESTATE CHARITY

Charity number: 501882
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 199 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 199 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required