SAVE LIFE

Charity number: 1143074
Charity reporting is overdue by 1561 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 12 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 100 days
Accounts and TAR 12 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 100 days
Annual return 12 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 465 days
Accounts and TAR 12 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 465 days
Annual return 12 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 831 days
Accounts and TAR 12 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 831 days
Annual return 12 August 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1196 days
Accounts and TAR 12 August 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1196 days
Annual return 12 August 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1561 days
Accounts and TAR 12 August 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1561 days