Trustees RIFT VALLEY RESEARCH LIMITED
Charity number: 1144010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Haile Menkerios | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hala Yassin Elkarib | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Walker Harper | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Margaret Workman Buchanan Smith | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Leben Moro Nelson | Trustee | 08 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Maynard | Trustee | 14 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Comfort Ero | Trustee | 15 January 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.