Financial history ZEENATUL QURAN

Charity number: 1146508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £59.02k £85.97k £69.56k £75.94k £114.44k
Total expenditure £57.67k £71.37k £67.07k £71.10k £103.29k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £5.62k