Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH SURBITON HILL WITH EMMANUEL, TOLWORTH
Charity number: 1143331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
26 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev John Shepherd | Chair | 13 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Hilary Jane Woods | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|||||
David Martin Speed-Andrews | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN MARK WALPOLE | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Olukayode Olatunbosun Rotowa | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Clayton | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mojgan Maramba | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kyung-Hwa Kim Kate | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paola Leverick | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Gould | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Walpole | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Animashaun | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dermot O'Brien | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Metcalfe | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Steven Young | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Emmanuel Olusoji Baikie | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Kresinska | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN BRIAN WALDEN | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Anthony Newell | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CARA ANNE RODGER | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE YOUNG | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Godfrey William Vosper | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
COLIN DEREK RODGER | Trustee | 22 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
REV BART ERLEBACH | Trustee | 21 June 2011 |
|
|||||
MR ANDY WHELAN | Trustee | 21 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS SUE WATSON | Trustee | 21 June 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.