Trustees THE LANGDON FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1142742

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Ian Doffman | Chair | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
DANIEL THEODORE KLEIN | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Corrin Helene Kaye | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Claire Lemer | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
ANDREW DAVID LOFTUS | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Philip Goldberg | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Richard Joseph Levy | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Emma Nathalie Castleton | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Paul Joseph | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Stephanie Ruth Cooper | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Karen Ann Phillips MBE | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Benjamin Mark Simon Kenneth Miller | Trustee | 22 December 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||||
NIGEL HENRY | Trustee | 05 November 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.