Trustees GLOBAL CLUBFOOT INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1146134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR CHRISTOPHER LAVY FRCS Chair 21 December 2011
WORLD ORTHOPAEDIC CONCERN UK
Received: 29 days late
LAVY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Jonathan Christian Edward Bishop Trustee 28 June 2022
None on record
Esperance Uwizeye Trustee 23 June 2021
None on record
Elizabeth Capper Trustee 19 May 2020
None on record
Denise Watson Trustee 21 May 2019
None on record
Mohommad Mamun Hossen Chowdhury Trustee 22 May 2018
Learn For Life
Received: On time
DAVID JONES FRCS Trustee 22 May 2018
WELSH MUSEUM OF HEALTH AND MEDICINE
Overdue by 50 days
Arthur Ngoka Trustee 22 May 2018
SYDENHAM GARDEN
Received: On time
STEVE MANNION Trustee 21 December 2011
None on record