OSWESTRY TOWN MUSEUM LIMITED

Charity number: 1144394
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £18.52k £9.82k £6.45k £11.43k £20.14k
Total expenditure £16.37k £6.72k £7.23k £11.85k £20.05k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k N/A N/A £5.75k £5.00k